+ − Actions (48)
On June 26, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Vetoed in Part by Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 10, 2002 in the House:
- House Refuses to Adopt
- House Requests a Further Conference - AYES: 79 NOES: 67
On May 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Grant House Further Conference
On May 10, 2002 in the House:
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 136 NOES: 15
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 17
On May 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 26 NAYS: 6
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 26 NAYS: 6
On May 9, 2002 in the House:
- Conference Committee Substitute
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Conferees to Exceed Differences
On May 9, 2002 in the House:
- Conferees to Exceed Differences
On May 2, 2002 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES GREEN , KELLY , WILSON (42BEARDEN, LEGAN
On April 29, 2002 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On April 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS RUSSELL, ROHRBACH, WESTFALL, GOODE AND WIGGINS
On April 25, 2002 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Appropriations
On April 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 4, 2002 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over - HCS AS AMENDED AND HA 4 PENDING
- Perfected with Amendments - HSA 1 FOR HA 2, HA 3, HA 6, HSA 1 FOR HA 8 ADOPTED AYES: 143 NOES: 12
- HCS Adopted
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 12
On March 21, 2002 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 20, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 19, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On March 14, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On March 13, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
- Read Second Time
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor