+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MARCH 28, 2012, 8:00AM, SCR 1
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 137 NOES: 012
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 5, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2012 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 21, 2011 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor