+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 12, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 00
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, APRIL 12, 8:30AM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, APRIL 5, 9:00AM, SENATE LOUNGE
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 000
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On January 5, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2012 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 21, 2011 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor