+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Pensions and General Laws
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 2
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time