+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time