+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- SEE COMMENTS - MOTION TO CONCUR IN SA 1
- Laid Over - SA 1 PENDING
- House Refuses to Concur - SA 1 AYES: 136 NOES: 23 PRESENT: 1
- House Requests Senate to Recede - AND TAKE UP AND PASS THE BILL
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SA 1
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Aging,Families, Mental & Public Health
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 1
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 3 ADOPTED
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: Agriculture
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor