+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor