+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor