+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 21, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate General Laws and Pensions
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 129 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Rules
- Reported Do Pass by Consent - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Trade and Tourism
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor