+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 12, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 147 NOES: 10
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 9
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 152 NOES: 4
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 4
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 4
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 3
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES FISHER, JONES, FUNDERBURK, WALSH AND FRAME
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS GRIESHEIMER, RUPP, DEMPSEY, CALLAHAN AND JUSTUS
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AS AMENDED
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 6, 2009 12:00P.M. SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 154 NOES: 0
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 0
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Refer: Spec Stand Com on Workforce Dev & Workplace Safety
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor