+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 9, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up
- House Adopts - SS ADOPTED AYES: 142 NOES: 8
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 135 NOES: 10
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 131 NOES: 19
- House Message
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 31
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 31
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 1:15pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 130 NOES: 18
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: General Laws
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor