+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time