+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
- Public Hearing Held
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, May 5, 2014, 2:45pm, Pershing Conference Room
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - voted do pass
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 98 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 1
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Perfected - AYES: 104 NOES: 51
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
4372H01.04H
Distributed
4372H01.02H
Distributed
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor