+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 16, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2004 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 149 NOES: 0
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 1
- House Concurs - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 148 NOES: 0
- Motion to Reconsider Adopted - ADOPTION OF EMERGENCY CLAUSE, TRULY AGREED AND FINALLY PASSED, AND ADOPTION OF SCS AYES: 140 AYES: 140 AYES: 135 NOES: 5 NOES: 6 NOES: 11
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 155 NOES: 1
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 155 NOES: 0
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 0
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 0
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted - SPA 1 ADOPTED
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 156 NOES: 0
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 156 NOES: 0
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor