+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 25, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
On April 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 157 NOES: 0
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor