+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 137 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 23 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
0262H02.03H
Adopted
0262H02.01H
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor