+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Job Creation and Economic Development
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time