+ − Actions (23)
On June 29, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 00
On April 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Public Health and Welfare
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES; 001
On March 28, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 8, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 27, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 23, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Children, Families, and Health
On January 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 7, 2000 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor