+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1-TUESDAY, APRIL 11, 2006 12:00PM
On April 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On March 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 132 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 9
On March 29, 2006 in the House:
- Pursuant to Rule 44 - HBs for Perfection Consent - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2005 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor