+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - not Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - not Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Children, Families, and Persons with Disabilities
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 2, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor