+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 ADOPTED YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- SS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SS & SA 1 PENDING
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 10, 8:30AM, SCR 1
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 2:45OPM, PERSHING CONFERENCE ROOM
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 16, 2:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 98 NOES: 55
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 5, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2012 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 6, 2011 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor