+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS HCS HB 1040 AND HCS HB 1041 VOTED DO PASS SEE HB 1040
On April 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 125 NOES: 33
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 126 NOES: 35
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 7, HSA 1 FOR HA 10, HA 1 TO HSA 1 FOR HA 10, HA 11 ADOPTED
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over - HA 7 ADOPTED/HSA 1 FOR HA 10 AND HA 10 AND HCS AS AMENDED PENDING
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over - HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 ADOPTED
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 13, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
- Referred: Education
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor