+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On January 13, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor