+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 11, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Tax Reform
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor