+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 16 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Small Business
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor