+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Job Creation and Economic Development
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor