+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Education
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
1688L01.02H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor