+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On June 29, 2006 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2006 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
On May 2, 2006 in the House:
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 90 NOES: 70
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 90 NOES: 69
On May 1, 2006 in the House:
- Conference Committee Substitute
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
On April 27, 2006 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 25, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
- Conferee Removed - REP. ROBB REPLACING REP. HOBBS
- Conferee Removed - REP.HOBBS REPLACING REP.ROBB
On April 20, 2006 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES ICET, BEARDEN, ROBB, EL-AMIN AND DONNELLY
On April 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS GROSS, NODLER, MAYER, DOUGHERTY AND BRAY
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On April 20, 2006 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 1
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On March 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Appropriations
On March 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 84 NOES: 68 PRESENT: 1
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Laid Over
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit
- Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
- Read Second Time
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor