+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 8, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 3
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 137 NOES: 3
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 4, 2011, 8:15AM, SCR 1
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rural Community Development
- Read Second Time
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor