+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 11, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor