+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
- Public Hearing Continued - ADDITIONAL PUBLIC HEARING DUE TO INCLEMENT WEATHER
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
On January 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor