+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On April 22, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
- Public Hearing Scheduled - 8:00AM, SCR 2
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
- Public Hearing Scheduled - 8:00AM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 2
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
- Public Hearing Scheduled - 8:00AM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 2
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - 11:00AM, SCR 2
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Appropriations
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 161 NOES: 0
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Laid Over - HCS PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit
- Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit - SIX HOURS TOTAL DEBATE FOR PERFECTION ON HCS HB 1 THROUGH HCS HB 13
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
- Read Second Time
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor