+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On March 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2018: Adopted (House)
March 24, 2018: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor