+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Vote
March 20, 2017: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor