+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules