+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2016: Adopted (House)
February 25, 2016: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor