+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules