+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules