+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2014: Adopted (House)
March 4, 2014: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor