+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted To Senate
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules