+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2022: Adopted (House)
March 1, 2022: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor