+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2020: Adopted (House)
March 4, 2020: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor