+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Died In Committee
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred To Constitution
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Motion to Reconsider Tabled
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Entered
- Adopted
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Vote
February 5, 2018: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor