+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules