+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 2, 2016: Adopted (House)
January 28, 2016: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor