+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules