+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules