+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 12, 2020: Adopted (House)
February 4, 2020: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor