+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules