+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Signed
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Returned For Enrolling
- Immediate Release
- Adopted
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred To Rules
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted To House
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title Suff Do Be Adopted
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2022: Adopted (House)
February 2, 2022: Adopted (Senate)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor